Accounts and annual returns THE TANTO COSÌ TRUST

Charity number: 1176976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 September 2024 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 September 2024 694 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2024 1059 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 April 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required