THE TANTO COSÌ TRUST

Charity number: 1176976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise funds and awareness in order to make grants to organisations which provide end of life care or education to women and girls.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Toby Desforges Chair 01 January 2018
None on record
GILES DESFORGES Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
JOANNA DESFORGES Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.12k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £310 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 September 2024 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 September 2024 694 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2024 1059 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 April 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 WOTHORPE PARK
FIRST DRIFT
WOTHORPE
STAMFORD
PE9 3LA
Phone:
07874354194
Email:
No information available