MUMSAID MATERNAL MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Supporting the mental health and emotional health and well-being of women in London during pregnancy and early motherhood; b) Providing specialist 1-1 perinatal counselling from counsellors who are clinically supervised and trained; c) Organising counselling groups and other therapeutic support; and d) Providing access to health professionals and other frontline staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £88,060 from 1 government contract(s) and £161,651 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 September 2018: CIO registration
- MUMSAID MATERNAL MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT C.I.C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Smith-Morgan | Chair | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Murray | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McDermott | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Polly Ali | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zenah Shuhaiber | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Renu Assi | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grishma Ramesh Patel | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Pearson | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Alison Harland | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL THOMPSON | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.63k | £619.02k | £331.24k | £426.29k | £384.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.31k | £287.87k | £360.53k | £383.44k | £374.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £97.12k | £97.12k | £104.12k | £134.22k | £88.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £161.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £564.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £54.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £287.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2018 as amended on 11 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The purposes of the CIO are the preservation and protection of health and the advancement of good health in particular by: a) Supporting the mental health and emotional health and well-being of women and families especially during pregnancy and early motherhood; b) Providing a holistic support service tailored to individual need including specialist 1-1 perinatal and other counselling from counsellors who are clinically supervised and trained; c) Delivering therapeutic groups and facilitating peer support; d) Providing information, advice, guidance and community advocacy to resolve issues and identify available support options; e) Sharing MumsAid's specialist knowledge and disseminating best practice to raise awareness and understanding of how to support maternal and family mental health.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUMSAID
184 - 186 WESTCOMBE HILL
BLACKHEATH
- Phone:
- 07758763908
- Email:
- info@mums-aid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window