CHRISTIAN RESPONSIBILITY IN PUBLIC AFFAIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Responsibility in Public Affairs (CRPA) supports people in positions of influence and responsibility in business, finance, politics, media, arts, education and public services. Activities include lectures, dinners, conferences with international speakers who address topical and ethical subjects and relate them to Christian values and perspectives. It has no political affiliation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 March 2018: CIO registration
- CRPA (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD GRIFFITHS OF FFORESTFACH | Chair | 10 May 1968 |
|
|||||
Rev John Lenton | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Devlin | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||
RUTH MARIA KELLY | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|||||
STEWART WORTH NEWTON | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|||||
PHILIP KENNETH WOOD | Trustee | 05 March 2001 |
|
|||||
Professor LORD MCCOLL OF DULWICH CBE | Trustee | 24 May 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10 | £28.55k | £59.50k | £51.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £23.18k | £52.06k | £56.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WORLDWIDE, IN PARTICULAR BY:- (1) FORMING GROUPS AMONG CHRISTIAN MEN AND WOMEN IN GOVERNMENT, COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, EDUCATION AND OTHER PROFESSIONS TO MEET FOR DISCUSSION, PRAYER AND FELLOWSHIP, TO HELP EACH OTHER INDIVIDUALLY AND CORPORATELY TO RELATE TO THEIR FAITH TO THEIR WORK, THEIR LIFE AND THEIR SOCIETY (2) BRINGING ABOUT THROUGH THE INFLUENCE AND ACTIVITY OF SUCH GROUPS A WIDER AWARENESS OF THE RELEVANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO DAILY HUMAN ISSUES OR PROBLEMS; (3) PROMOTING THESE AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS IN EACH COUNTRY TO MAINTAIN CONTACT WITH EACH OTHER AND WITH OTHER GROUPS OF RESPONSIBLE CHRISTIANS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD SO THAT THEY MAY BECOME:- (A) A DYNAMIC FORCE FOR CHRIST THROUGH THE HOLY SPIRIT; AND (B) A CREATIVE AND REDEMPTIVE INFLUENCE FOR GOOD AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS A WHOLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 ST. HILDAS ROAD
LONDON
SW13 9JE
- Phone:
- 02087486029
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
CRPA-office.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window