LOW ACKWORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a local community facility
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 14 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pam Cutler | Chair | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
stuart gormley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
john bell | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
lydia horobin | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHARON MAIDEN secretary | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ROOKE | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
anthony hames | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
john cousins treasurer | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clough | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
terry cutler | Trustee | 03 April 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.30k | £200 | £5.76k | £7.27k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £1.04k | £2.18k | £4.42k | £4.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ACKWORTH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ACKWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Station Road
Ackworth
Low Ackworth
Pontefract
WF7 7LU
- Phone:
- 07966247816
- Email:
- jcousins23@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window