NEVEREST ORTHOPAEDICS FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sending a team of orthopaedic surgeons/theatre professionals to Nepal hospitals, to see patients, carry out operations and teach orthopaedics both in clinic & operating theatres
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
Governance
- 28 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor ROHAN ANANDA RAJAN | Chair | 28 February 2018 |
|
|||||
JAMES EDWARD METCALFE | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL DAVID SAUNDERS | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- 2.1 RELIEVING PATIENTS RECEIVING TREATMENT AT ANY HOSPITAL IN NEPAL OR ELSEWHERE OR ON THEIR DISCHARGE WHO ARE ILL SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; 2.2 SETTING UP A LONG TERM PROGRAMME OF MEDICAL ASSISTANCE, FUNDING TRIPS, PROVIDING SURGICAL EQUIPMENT OR TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS PRIMARILY IN NEPAL; 2.3 RELIEVING SICKNESS AND PROTECTING GOOD HEALTH PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN DERBYSHIRE OR NEPAL; 2.4 PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC RESEARCH INTO AND EDUCATION ABOUT THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ILLNESS SICKNESS DISABILITY HANDICAP INFIRMITY AND DISEASE AND ESPECIALLY LOWER AND / OR UPPER LIMB DISABILITY AND DISEASE PROVIDED THAT THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED; AND 2.5 SUPPORTING SUCH CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE BY MAKING GRANTS FOR SPECIFIC PURPOSES WHICH THE TRUSTEES HAVE DETERMINED. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT FOR THE TIME BEING CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 The Farthingales
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 1TE
- Phone:
- 01283 337754
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window