YDT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 BY PROVIDING OR FACILITATING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITHIN A JEWISH FRAMEWORK WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Salford City
Governance
- 26 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRACHA HASSELL | Chair | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ZALMAN KLYNE | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL HAMMOND | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.44k | £207.61k | £354.69k | £185.54k | £27.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.84k | £151.93k | £196.81k | £314.22k | £47.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 BY PROVIDING OR FACILITATING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITHIN A JEWISH FRAMEWORK AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 LICHFIELD DRIVE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 0HX
- Phone:
- 07855744865
- Email:
- ydtmanchester@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window