AUTISM VOICE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- To raise awareness about the existence of Autism amongst the BEM Communities - To advance the education of the BEM communities in the UK and abroad about Autism, to stop stigma, Ostracism and discrimination against people and families affected by Autism. - To promote inclusion of people affected by autism in activities and daily life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beryl Adenike Iwuala | Chair | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lahai | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
AUGUSTA SIAW | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MAHMOUD KOROMA | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.99k | £47.18k | £71.14k | £126.26k | £154.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.83k | £37.53k | £56.69k | £98.80k | £104.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND HELP TO FAMILIES WHO ARE CONNECTED TO PEOPLE WITH AUTISM, 2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY RAISING AWARENESS IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
161- 167 Clapham Manor Street
LONDON
SW4 6DB
- Phone:
- 07943236212
- Email:
- info@autismvoice.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window