TUTORING TO THRIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS UNDER THE AGE OF 19 ENROLLED IN ACADEMY SCHOOLS RUN BY THE ARK MULTI ACADEMY TRUST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Mary Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Daniel Peltz | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
ELEONORA RAYDEN | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David Levin | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.61k | £17.14k | £41.24k | £54.87k | £47.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.92k | £25.38k | £8.94k | £37.39k | £44.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS UNDER THE AGE OF 19 ENROLLED IN ACADEMY SCHOOLS RUN BY THE ARK MULTI ACADEMY TRUST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY:- A. OFFERING INTENSIVE SMALL GROUP TUITION TO PUPILS IN YEARS 10-13 DESIGNATED BY ARK SCHOOLS AS HAVING “HIGH PRE-ASSESSED ABILITY” TO ACHIEVE OUTSTANDING GSCSE AND A LEVEL RESULTS WITH A VIEW TO GAINING ADMISSION TO ELITE AND PRESTIGIOUS UNIVERSITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND UNITED STATES B. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSON’S SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 De Walden Court
85 New Cavendish Street
London
W1W 6XD
- Phone:
- 07540418559
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window