Financial history THE SWAN SONG PROJECT

Charity number: 1178096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £33.69k £39.89k £56.77k £38.29k £42.64k
Total expenditure £17.61k £37.16k £43.67k £57.49k £40.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A