GLOUCESTER VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gloucester Vineyard Church is an evangelical church based in Gloucestershire. We are creating a community which brings hope and joy to Gloucester by introducing people to Jesus and teaching them to live by his example. We are committed to the alleviation of poverty, especially that which effects children and helping all people become all they were created to be.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL THOMAS SMITH | Chair | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Darren Reho | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Meredith | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Burnhope | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOMA LEIGH LAWTON | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.04k | £40.82k | £69.18k | £85.63k | £103.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.57k | £29.29k | £55.79k | £68.46k | £95.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD THROUGH: -THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP; -THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFIL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH, VISITORS TO THE CHURCH AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; -THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN TRAINING AND SERVICE; -THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELISM AND OUTREACH; -THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN ITS MINISTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Methodist Church
Northgate Street
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2AN
- Phone:
- 07546269726
- Email:
- hello@gloucestervineyard.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window