Accounts and annual returns CARLETON ENDOWED SCHOOL

Charity number: 510936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 October 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 October 2022 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 March 2021 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required