Trustees CARLETON ENDOWED SCHOOL
Charity number: 510936

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE KAREN BROWN | Chair | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathia Andree Shoesmith | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Holmes | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Claxton | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Faith Clayton-Stead | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hart | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BRIAN BROWN | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MASON | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.