BROOMHILL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Broomhill Community Trust operates from Broomhill Community Library, 10 Taptonville Road, Broomhill, Sheffield, S10 5BR. The Trust was established to progress the development of the library building and its heritage garden, and also now operates the volunteer-run Community Library services and activities. It raises funds through donations, grants and developed revenue streams.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £495 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 08 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH PITCHFORTH | Chair | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aline Yasmine | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ann Carr | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hari Hara Subramanian Raghuraman | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Anne Beagles | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE HARBORD | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN WHITTAKER | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE NUNN | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £53.15k | £16.62k | £20.97k | £34.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.31k | £5.08k | £5.74k | £12.07k | £17.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £340 | £600 | £1.32k | £495 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF BCT ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DISTRICT OF BROOMHILL, SHEFFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY LENDING LIBRARY AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES; (B) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (C) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE GARDENS AT ORIEL HOUSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROOMHILL LIBRARY
10 TAPTONVILLE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 5BR
- Phone:
- 01142734276
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window