Trustees BROOMHILL COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1176562

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH PITCHFORTH | Chair | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aline Yasmine | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ann Carr | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hari Hara Subramanian Raghuraman | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Anne Beagles | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE HARBORD | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN WHITTAKER | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE NUNN | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.