GOOD SHEPHERD RELIEF IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities involve the relief of poverty, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability or financial hardship. Achieved through provision of household items such as furniture and goods along with personal items such as clothing. Beneficiaries of these activities are located within the City of Wolverhampton and its local environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 03 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Hughes Mr | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev MARK HATHORNE | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERESA HODSON | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.93k | £34.94k | £79.78k | £69.92k | £300 | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.37k | £22.77k | £87.14k | £68.75k | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £15.30k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOUSEHOLD ITEMS SUCH AS FURNITURE AND OTHER ITEMS SUCH AS CLOTHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 GRASMERE AVENUE
PERTON
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 7PW
- Phone:
- 01902 497114
- Email:
- ann.reaney@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window