STEPPING STONES LEARNING AND LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STEPPING STONES PROVIDES A RANGE OF MUCH NEEDED EDUCATION AND LEISURE CLASSES FOR ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, ENABLING AN OFTEN NEGLECTED SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY TO WORK FROM A BASE WHERE THEY CAN MAKE NEW FRIENDS AND BUILD THEIR SKILLS. THE CLASSES PROMOTE HEALTH & HYGIENE; EXERCISE & FITNESS; THE ARTS, SKILLS FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING AND SELF-DEVELOPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £16,500 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 26 September 2017: CIO registration
- 01 December 2019: Funds received from 1110583 THE STEPPING STONES PROJECT GATEWAY CLUB
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Keaveney-Sheath | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Avery Jayne Benton | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Bransby | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SALLY REID | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terence David Baldwin | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER WALMSLEY | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.67k | £47.19k | £65.89k | £100.61k | £35.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.63k | £49.62k | £54.22k | £65.63k | £67.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.25k | £12.25k | £17.75k | £26.25k | £16.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES RESIDENT IN SOUTHWARK AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND SERVICES THAT ARE SPECIALLY DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN SOUTHWARK AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY BECAUSE THEY FACE DISCRIMINATION, OR ARE UNABLE TO EASILY DRIVE, USE PUBLIC TRANSPORT OR OTHERWISE ACCESS SERVICES. 3) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE PUBLIC OF THE RESTRICTIONS FACING THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND PROVISION OF SERVICES THROUGH WHICH THIS CAN BE ALLEVIATED. 4) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHWARK AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR, BY: PROVIDING CLASSES AND ACTIVITIES IN SUBJECTS INCLUDING DRAMA, COOKING, ART, MUSIC, KEEP FIT, GARDENING, DANCE AND WALKING GROUP (AND OTHER SUBJECTS WHICH ARE DRIVEN BY THE NEEDS AND WISHES TO THE ADULTS WHO ATTEND) THAT ENABLE PEOPLE WHO HAVE LEARNING DISABILITIES TO INTERACT SOCIALLY IN ORDER TO REDUCE SOCIAL ISOLATION AND PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FAITHS COMMUNITY CENTRE
RED POST HILL
LONDON
SE24 9JQ
- Phone:
- 07950612914
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window