THE HASLEMERE THESPIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur theatre company
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 February 2018: CIO registration
- 16 April 2021: Funds received from 292020 THE HASLEMERE THESPIANS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Patricia Perrett | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tom Parrott | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Parrott | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Wright | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Greenwood | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr KIMBERLEY-CLAIR SEYMOUR | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hatchell | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Andrew Perrett | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE WAGHORN | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADAM TIMOTHY FREDERICK FORDE | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linnet Adele Bird | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.08k | £22 | £31.94k | £35.17k | £47.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.28k | £5.02k | £36.45k | £30.40k | £38.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Feb 2018 as amended on 30 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES PARTICULARLY THE ART AND SCIENCE OF DRAMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 The Old Quarry
HASLEMERE
Surrey
GU27 3SS
- Phone:
- 07810443566
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window