DEBEN YACHT CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deben Yacht Club promotes community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit in Woodbridge and the surrounding area by the provision of facilities for sailing, including: - providing teaching in the skills of sailing in dinghies and yachts; - providing training for instructors and members including safety practices and the use of safety power boats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 April 2019: CIO registration
- DYC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Kemp | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Mary Wickson | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Woodard | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Bernard Adams | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ADRIAN KWOK MAN YEUNG | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Philip James | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VERNON HAYHOW | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||
DIANA COBB | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MARGARET ALEXANDER | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GEORGE PREVETT | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE BRADBURN | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.56k | £76.56k | £76.20k | £84.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.97k | £80.92k | £57.02k | £22.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Apr 2019 as amended on 16 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
3. Objects The objects of the CIO are: The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit in Woodbridge and the surrounding area by the provision of facilities for sailing and paddle sports including: - providing learning and teaching in the skills of sailing in dinghies and yachts; - providing learning and teaching in paddling skills; - providing training for instructors and members including in safety practices and the use of safety power boats
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deben Yacht Club
River Wall
WOODBRIDGE
IP12 4BB
- Phone:
- 01394385400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window