Financial history MK CHRISTMAS PARTY FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity number: 1176046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.25k £5.73k £8.07k £5.62k £10.78k
Total expenditure £10.90k £1.33k £8.57k £9.39k £10.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A