MK CHRISTMAS PARTY FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve Elderly people resident in Milton Keynes & surrounding areas who are alone on Christmas day by providing Christmas meal along with entertainment full day
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 01 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA LOUISE SEABROOK | Chair | 25 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Seabrook | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pam Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAMILTON SEABROOK | Trustee | 25 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25k | £5.73k | £8.07k | £5.62k | £10.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.90k | £1.33k | £8.57k | £9.39k | £10.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN MILTON KEYNES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF CHRISTMAS DINNER AND ENTERTAINMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 HUNSTANTON WAY
BLETCHLEY
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 7RX
- Phone:
- 07905459682
- Email:
- committee.mkxmas@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window