Trustees BANGOR ON DEE SPORTS FIELD
Charity number: 510945

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Carey Jones | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Spoor | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Richards | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debra Burns | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH JOBSON | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BROPHY | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Grice | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANN SPOOR | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY NEALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY ARTHUR GRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK FIRTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.