Financial history THE SIGNALLING RECORD SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1176506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.27k £40.29k £35.06k £33.15k £43.84k
Total expenditure £27.43k £21.07k £31.11k £31.58k £44.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A