GAMBIA HEALTHCARE MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEDICAL SUPPLIES: to primary and secondary care services, for Gambians and people living in The Gambia. HEALTH PROMOTION: Promote healthy lifestyles across communities; rural & urban to help control and prevent diseases. HEALTH EDUCATION: Provide information on healthy living, encourage access to services, involvement in health decisions and promote behavioural change to stay healthy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- The Gambia
Governance
- 04 December 2017: CIO registration
- GAMBIA DIASPORA HEALTH INITIATIVE (GDHI) (Previous name)
- GAMBIAN DIASPORA HEALTH INITIATIVE (GDHI) (Previous name)
- GAMBIAN DIASPORA HEALTH INITIATIVE (GDHI) (Previous name)
- GAMBIAN DIASPORA HEALTHCARE INITIATIVE (GDHI) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSA KRUBALLY | Chair | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aminata Hydara | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Owens | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17k | £1.10k | £2.66k | £8.06k | £2.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £1.15k | £1.81k | £5.98k | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 285 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 July 2023 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2023 | 353 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 July 2023 | 717 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 July 2023 | 717 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 DEC 2017 AMENDED ON 14 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING IN THE GAMBIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SUPPLIES FROM THE UK TO VARIOUS HOSPITALS IN THE GAMBIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 COMYNS ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM9 6PB
- Phone:
- 07703681992
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window