Accounts and annual returns HEREFORD STIENER ACADEMY

Charity number: 510956
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 28 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 28 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 09 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 09 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 20 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 23 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 28 January 2009 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 08 July 2008 8 days late