CREATING CHAOS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide community support and activities to help to improve the local area for all residents, but in particular those that would be deemed vulnerable. These tasks and supports are offered by young adults with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSE STONE | Chair | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Charters | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH THOMPSON | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KERRY WHAPSHOTT | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.08k | £62.67k | £65.37k | £61.75k | £61.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.36k | £67.25k | £42.70k | £61.29k | £58.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2024 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2024 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 January 2024 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 January 2024 | 430 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2022 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 January 2021 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 23 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LEIGH ROAD
HAVANT
PO9 2ET
- Phone:
- 02392471061
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window