FRIENDS OF WOODVILLE PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Woodville, Swadlincote, Derbyshire and the surrounding area the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MALC GEE | Chair | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR DON REDFERN | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN BENNETT | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ALLEN | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMILY MOORE | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.51k | £3.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.51k | £64.74k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £52.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOODVILLE, SWADLINCOTE, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Briar Close
Newhall
SWADLINCOTE
DE11 0RX
- Phone:
- 07901685125
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window