FRIENDS OF RHONDDA ROTARY COMMUNITY SHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using the community shop to provide money, items or services to individuals and groups who provide front line services within the community. These groups or individuals will be chosen by our trustees as those who represent the most vulnerable within the Rhondda valleys, with special consideration for Youth and Old Age groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 19 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANNETTE RITA ELLIS | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GERALD ROSE | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUNE VIOLET GEORGINA ELLIS | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2018 | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.88k | £29.27k | £29.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £708 | £30.97k | £23.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1067 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1067 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 10 January 2022 | 588 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | 10 January 2022 | 588 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THE RHONDDA VALLEY BY: A) PROVIDING GRANTS TO GROUPS OR INDIVIDUALS WHO REPRESENT THE MOST VULNERABLE WITHIN THE RHONDDA VALLEYS; B) TRAINING FOR THE LONG TERM UNEMPLOYED, THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES IN SHOP WORK AND EXPERIENCE IN RETAIL; AND C) ANY OTHER SUCH SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN FURTHERANCE OF SAID CHARITABLE OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EBENEZER CHAPEL
WYNDHAM STREET
TREHERBERT
TREORCHY
CF42 5BT
- Phone:
- 01443777651
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window