Financial history THE OVER FIFTIES YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 1176296
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £11.75k £10.32k £11.79k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.37k £11.98k £10.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A