REACT HUMANITARIAN NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REACT is charity with a primary aim of making education accessible to Ghanaian Disabled children suffering from ill-health, financial hardships or other disadvantages. At REACT our goal is to "REACT" thus R-elieve disabled children of stigma, E-ducate them in the process, A-dvance their well-being, C-ater for their specific needs and ultimately help T-urn disability into ability through education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 15 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WISDOM BESSIE-DENTE | Chair | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Acquah | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KOFI OWUSU AGYEMANG | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FELIX NANA KOFI OFORI | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD EMERSON AMPONSAH | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIA OPOKU | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABENA OFEI-AGYEMANG | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
EDEM OPOKU | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEON ROOS | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.47k | £1.80k | £10.07k | £3.48k | £4.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.11k | £3.10k | £7.53k | £2.60k | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 09 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITIES LIVING IN GHANA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS FOR DISABLED CHILDREN, AS WELL AS SCHOLARSHIP SCHEMES FOR THE MOST DISADVANTAGED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Goldsmith Close
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX12 7GL
- Phone:
- 01235244801
- Email:
- rhnonline.org@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window