Financial history GURU NANAK SAT SANG GURUDWARA

Charity Number: 510960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.81k £3.00k £23.19k £25.54k £24.54k
Total expenditure £20.89k £8.23k £13.77k £15.79k £19.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A