MY MITO MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising awareness, funds for research and support for everyone with mitochondrial disease
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE BEAL | Chair | 21 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin Haigh MBE | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Francesca Sevilla-Rebelderia | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Amanda Caldwell | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Appleby | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|||||
BETHANY ELLIS | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.47k | £27.57k | £34.44k | £61.88k | £108.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.62k | £29.72k | £8.84k | £83.49k | £71.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUG 2017 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONG SCIENTISTS AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS) IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF THE DISEASE, WITH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO BE DISSEMINATED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
My Mito Mission
Unit 4
Gannex Park
Dewsbury Road
ELLAND
West Yor
- Phone:
- 01484719250
- Email:
- contact@mymitomission.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window