PERFORMANCE ARTS LAB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance arts lab is a registered UK charity providing elite level arts education to young emerging artists in the form of an international annual summer school. In addition we offer immersive arts in business workshops to organisations and companies in order to develop cognitive skills, teamwork, communication and creativity in the workplace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Slovenia
Governance
- 17 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Forrest Orr | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michael John Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Elizabeth Barbara Holford | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Robert Coverley Medcalf | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Melissa Wickremasinghe | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.20k | £19.59k | £10.16k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.89k | £12.35k | £14.71k | £1.10k | £228 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO FACILITATE ARTS EDUCATION AND COLLABORATION INTERNATIONALLY AND TO FACILITATE COLLABORATION BETWEEN THE ARTS EDUCATION AND BUSINESS SECTORS INTERNATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 BERRYMEAD GARDENS
LONDON
W3 8AB
- Phone:
- 02089924581
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window