Accounts and annual returns THE LIVING HEART UK

Charity Number: 1178372
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On Time