CHAIM V'SHALVAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHAIM VSHALVAH RAISES FUNDS TO COVER OPERATIONAL COSTS INCURRED BY THE VEREIN FUR KRANKE UND ERHOLUNGSBEDURTIGE TO ENABLE ELIGIBLE INDIVIDUALS TO MAKE USE OF THE FACILITIES IN DAVOS, SWITZERLAND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Switzerland
Governance
- 13 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAKOB HALPERN | Chair | 16 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN KUFLIK | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|||||
ABRAHAM BAR-HORIN | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.19k | £199.06k | £20.64k | £16.85k | £24.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.59k | £29.81k | £65.82k | £9.83k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
A. TO ASSIST IN THE CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES [NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES], PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY. B. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ROSTREVOR AVENUE
LONDON
N15 6LA
- Phone:
- 02082111025
- Email:
- admin@chaimvshalvah.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window