DENHAM COMMUNITY CHARITY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the civil parish of Denham without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, nationality, age, disability, race or of political, religious or other opinions by advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edna Jean Austin | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Norman Clayton | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN HEATH | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMARJEET HANS | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr JULIA MARIA WALSH | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHARON WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £650 | £5 | £5 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 August 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 August 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO (“THE OBJECT”) IS TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF DENHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
VILLAGE ROAD
DENHAM
UXBRIDGE
UB9 5BN
- Phone:
- 01895834709
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
TBC
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window