SLV.GLOBAL MENTAL HEALTH FUND

Charity number: 1175589
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit the relief of sickness and the preservation of good health by reducing the stigma associated with mental illness and disability in Sri Lanka, Bali Indonesia and India by supporting the local mental health NGOs and charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 06 November 2019

Total income: £7,576
Total expenditure: £7,216

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 2017: CIO registration
  • 17 August 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 17 August 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/11/2018 06/11/2019
Total gross income £8.02k £7.58k
Total expenditure £7.82k £7.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 November 2019 20 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 November 2019 01 May 2020 On Time
Annual return 06 November 2018 20 April 2020 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 November 2018 20 April 2020 227 days late