SPINNAKER CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spinnaker Chorus is a barbershop singing group for women aged from 16 years in the Portsmouth and surrounding area. We sing four part harmony music educating ourselves in singing techniques through coaching and educating others through singing workshops and events. We perform for the public benefit and collaborate with groups to improve well-being through the joy of singing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Cook | Chair | 12 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Joanne Odell | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Nason | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
NUALA HELEN HOBDEN | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.58k | £25.54k | £35.24k | £44.45k | £61.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.02k | £17.02k | £28.80k | £56.16k | £65.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF CLOSE-HARMONY SINGING AND SINGING IN THE BARBERSHOP HARMONY STYLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 2
44-45 West Street
CHICHESTER
PO19 1RP
- Phone:
- 01243 941428
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window