Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF SWANAGE BANDSTAND

Charity Number: 1175077
Charity reporting is overdue by 1565 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 835 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 835 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1200 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1200 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1565 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1565 days