ASSEMBLY OF GOD MINISTRY ADORAI CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP SERVICES FOR THE COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 January 2018: Standard registration
- ASSEMBLY OF GOD CHURCH MINISTRY ALLIANCE - EAST LONDON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Willian Cesar de Oliveira | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAYANE XAVIER DE QUEIROZ SPRICIGO | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ORCEJANE RODRIGUES DA SILVA | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOAO EVANGELISTA JACINTO | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GABRIEL MARCHIORIO DE MATTOS | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.22k | £90.22k | £109.47k | £140.95k | £194.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.75k | £87.23k | £100.92k | £143.94k | £179.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 05 MAR 2019 as amended on 14 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (2) TO PROCLAIM THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL BELIEF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN MANY WAYS ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIANITY MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELING AND SUPPORT ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM. (4) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS AND EDUCATION PROGRAMS. (5) TO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATED WITH THE ASSEMBLY OF GOD CHURCH MINISTRY ALLIANCE - EAST LONDON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (6)TO GATHER TOGETHER FOR THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD, FOR CHRISTIAN WITNESS AND SERVICE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Rutland Road
ILFORD
Essex
IG1 1EN
- Phone:
- 07946059439
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window