Financial history Highly Sprung Performance

Charity number: 1178239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £372.58k £188.32k £472.77k £341.94k £268.93k
Total expenditure £358.02k £173.36k £373.61k £339.62k £352.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £24.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.00k £47.13k £14.80k £7.72k