Highly Sprung Performance

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to promote, improve and advance education in, and appreciation of, the arts of dance, drama and physical performance in particular but not exclusively among children and young people through the facilitation and management of educational workshops, participatory arts projects, group work, residencies and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,719 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 May 2018: CIO registration
- HIGHLY SPRUNG PERFORMANCE COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Lucy Adams | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kirsty Gibbons | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Davinder Kaur | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr JOSEPHINE TROWSDALE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE SINGLETON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.58k | £188.32k | £472.77k | £341.94k | £268.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.02k | £173.36k | £373.61k | £339.62k | £352.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £24.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £47.13k | £14.80k | £7.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 May 2018 as amended on 10 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS OF DANCE, DRAMA AND PHYSICAL PERFORMANCE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE FACILITATION AND MANAGEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS, PARTICIPATORY ARTS PROJECTS, GROUP WORK, RESIDENCIES AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHLY SPRUNG PERFORMANCE
DAIMLER POWERHOUSE
SANDY LANE BUSINESS PARK
SANDY LANE
COVENTRY
CV1 4DQ
- Phone:
- 07810263355
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window