UK SOCIETY FOR CO-OPERATIVE STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We publish the Journal of Co-operative Studies; put on an annual public lecture; and organise our annual conference, along with other ad hoc events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Colin Ronald Talbot | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Russell Gill | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elisavet Mantzari | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anita Mangan | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Maddocks | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Hurst | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francesca Gagliardi | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICK MATTHEWS | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Adderley | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Ruth Hall | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN LONERGAN | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.99k | £4.97k | £3.29k | £12.19k | £9.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | £866 | £6.31k | £9.37k | £5.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING ALL ASPECTS OF THE CO OPERATIVE MOVEMENT, AND CO-OPERATIVE FORMS OF STRUCTURE, AND IN PARTICULAR TO ASSIST, COMMISSION AND/OR IDENTIFY, AND TO PUBLISH RESEARCH INTO THE AFOREMENTIONED AREAS AND TO PROMOTE THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND EXPERIENCE ON CO-OPERATIVE STUDIES AND RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLYOAKE HOUSE
MANCHESTER
M60 0AS
- Phone:
- 0161 214 1750
- Email:
- info@ukscs.coop
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window