ROUNDWOOD BOWLS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote bowls for the inhabitants of Taverham and surrounding community as a healthy recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Moar | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Stiles | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kett | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARRY STILES | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.68k | £76.33k | £87.95k | £90.29k | £108.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.36k | £37.03k | £84.88k | £87.56k | £125.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.06k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TAVERHAM, NORWICH IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO AID THE ENGAGEMENT AND PARTICIPATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AMATEUR SPORT OF INDOOR BOWLING. THE CIO AIMS TO ACHIEVE ITS OBJECTS BY: (A) PROVIDING FACILITIES TO THE PUBLIC FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE AMATEUR SPORT OF INDOOR BOWLING; (B) ENSURING THAT THE FACILITIES HIRED AT ROUNDWOOD BOWLS CLUB ARE OFFERED AND UTILISED ON A FAIR AND EQUAL BASIS TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE CLUB; (C) OFFERING COACHING AND COMPETITIVE OPPORTUNITIES IN THE SPORT OF INDOOR BOWLING; (D) OFFERING SOCIAL AND NON-COMPETITIVE SESSIONS AND EVENTS TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE CLUB; (E) PROMOTING THE CLUB WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; (F) ENSURING THAT ALL RULES LAID DOWN BY THE GOVERNING BODIES OF THE SPORT ARE ADHERED TO; (G) SETTING ANY LOCAL RULES IN RELATION TO THE SPORT OF INDOOR BOWLING AS IS NECESSARY; (H) ENSURING A DUTY OF CARE TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE BOWLING CLUB; AND (I) SUPPORTING LOCAL CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roundwood House
44 Ringland Road
Taverham
NORWICH
NR8 6HY
- Phone:
- 01603 865045
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window