Financial history PLATFORM 4

Charity Number: 1177556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.10k £63.06k £67.27k £81.98k £61.96k
Total expenditure £38.26k £31.77k £65.63k £70.61k £74.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £63.06k £50.09k £63.84k £30.02k