Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S GOUDHURST
Charity number: 1175082

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rachel Robertson | Chair | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Williams | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Denis Edwin Darvill | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise Ogden | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grace Rebecca Wain | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Justin Hsuan | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Davis | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Louise Copplestone | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Wright | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Loy | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Cooke | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wallis Hosken | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Westley Richard Hinsley | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MAYHEW | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LODGE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BRAY VINTON | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.