Room at the Inn

Charity number: 1176629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the needs of people who are homeless, in threat of homelessness or otherwise marginalised in Warrington for the public benefit by providing emergency accommodation, daytime services and information, support and activities to enable them to lead more settled lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Warrington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 2018: CIO registration
  • 21 July 2020: Funds received from 505430 THE WARRINGTON DISTRICT PLAY COUNCIL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ROOM AT THE INN AND THE Y PROJECT (Previous name)
  • ROOM AT THE INN AND THE 'Y' PROJECT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Duckworth Chair 04 April 2023
CULTURE WARRINGTON
Received: On time
Fiona Louise Whitfield Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Lynne Griffith Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
dr Rachel Blake Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Selina Elizabeth Miller Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Louise Higginson Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Andrew Grundy Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
rev PAMELA LOVATT N/a Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £233.30k £376.43k £412.64k £448.95k £514.11k
Total expenditure £208.96k £295.93k £451.63k £495.29k £503.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £168.32k £200.00k £244.72k £280.18k
Income from government grants £36.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £213.93k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £300.18k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £502.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £968
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £94
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £112.97k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £31.73k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 February 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 February 2024 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 WINNMARLEIGH STREET
WARRINGTON
WA1 1NB
Phone:
01925632771