Financial history MUMS IN NEED

Charity number: 1177170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £59.79k £51.93k £123.51k £173.38k £144.54k
Total expenditure £33.12k £78.22k £106.33k £139.76k £162.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.50k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.89k £53.85k N/A £5.00k