ENGLISH4ALL IN LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing free English classes and related activities to adult speakers of other languages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £3,406 from 1 government contract(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Di Presa | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martina Simkova | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Fox | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrzej Tucholski | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre McKenna | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hossain Saeedi | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Snee | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marina Idiatulina | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Milada Walkova | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Cheng | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Young | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Raper | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARLA LOSS | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZSOFIA PELYVA | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £11.41k | £11.38k | £20.76k | £24.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £6.64k | £20.08k | £7.43k | £17.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.76k | £3.41k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 October 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 16 October 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 03 February 2021 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
(1)FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LEEDS AREA, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, BY PROVIDING FREE ACCESS TO ENGLISH LESSONS FOR ADULT SPEAKERS OF OTHER LANGUAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
English4All in Leeds
The Arches
56-58 Brussels Street
Leeds
LS9 8AB
- Phone:
- 07535867376
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window