Financial history REFUGEASE

Charity number: 1175022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.25k £60.15k £250.00k £748.54k £428.12k
Total expenditure £3.40k £51.54k £247.38k £680.38k £536.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £547 £547 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £392.55k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £347.75k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £8.24k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £311.65k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £368.73k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A